Dogfen lywodraethu THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 28TH APRIL 1924 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 15TH JULY 1974, 10TH MAY 1982, 10TH MAY 1993 AND 13TH DECEMBER 2006. as amended on 07 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE DIOCESE, BEING EDUCATION WHICH IS CONSISTENT WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGALND. 2. TO PROMOTE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND RELIGIOUS WORSSHIP IN SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE. 3. TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF CHURCH SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE. 4. TO PROMOTE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN ITSELFF AND OTHER PERSONS CONCERNED WITH EDUCATION IN THE DIOCESE.
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.