Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/11/1905 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2014 as amended on 05 Dec 2022 as amended on 05 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2 Objects (a) The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit and specifically restricted to: 2.1.1 promoting or assisting in the promotion of education in the Diocese that is consistent with the faith and practice of the Church of England; 2.1.2 promoting or assisting in the promotion of religious education and religious worship in schools in the Diocese; 2.1.3 promoting or assisting in the promotion of church schools in the Diocese; 2.1.4 promoting co-operation between itself and other persons concerned with education in the Diocese.
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.