Dogfen lywodraethu FARNHAM CASTLE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 10 JANUARY 1958 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30/06/1958, 27/04/1994, 14/01/1997, 26/4/00, 4/1/01, 12/5/04 , 08/09/04 AND 13/1/06 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO EDUCATE PEOPLE IN ORDER TO ENABLE THEM TO RELATE TO PEOPLE FROM OTHER CULTURES; B) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF FARNHAM CASTLE WHICH IS OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.