Dogfen lywodraethu COBHAM HALL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/04/1995 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2013 as amended on 26 Jun 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF ONE OR MORE SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO MAINTAIN AND CARRY ON THE GIRLS' SCHOOL KNOWN AS COBHAM HALL.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.