THE INDEPENDENT DANCERS RESETTLEMENT TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The principle activities are the provision of retraining for professional dancers from the contributing member companies classified as Restricted and the independent freelance division classified as Unrestricted. Also contributions received, that are not from contributing member companies, but, specific to an award are classified as Restricted Independent.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 19 Ebrill 2017: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1168958 DANCERS' CAREER DEVELOPMENT
- 30 Mawrth 1988: Cofrestrwyd
- 19 Ebrill 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- DANCERS' CAREER DEVELOPMENT (Enw gwaith)
- THE DANCERS RESETTLEMENT TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £483.55k | £371.94k | £466.61k | £397.65k | £445.47k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £684.10k | £493.30k | £475.96k | £453.25k | £466.00k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 26 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 26 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 08 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 22 Rhagfyr 2015 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 16 Ionawr 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 15 Rhagfyr 2014 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 MARCH 1988
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROVIDE VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONAL DANCERS WHO HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM DURING THE WHOLE OR PART OF THEIR CAREERS AS PROFESSIONAL DANCERS AND HAVE RECEIVED A FULL RECOGNISED DANCE TRAINING AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY FIND EMPLOYMENT OTHER THAN THAT OF A DANCER (B) TO SUPPORT ADVISE AND AID IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE THE PERSONS SPECIFIED IN SUB-CLAUSE (A) HEREOF AND THE WIVES AND CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE OR ARE ABOUT TO BE ENGAGED IN A COURSE OF EDUCATION OR TRAINING WITH A VIEW TO UNDERTAKING SUCH TRADE PROFESSION OR OCCUPATION AND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH SUPPORT ADVICE AND AID BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE (B) (I) AND (II) AND (C) OF TRUST DEED)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window