Dogfen lywodraethu Coram Intercountry Adoption Centre
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/01/2014 as amended on 01 Jul 2023 as amended on 27 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
[A] TO ADVANCE THE WELFARE OF CHILDREN THROUGH PUBLIC EDUCATION IN INTERCOUNTRY ADOPTION PARTICULARLY , BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, CONSULTATION AND TRAINING SO AS TO BENEFIT CHILDREN ADOPTED, OR TO BE ADOPTED FROM OVERSEAS. [B[ TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO BY REASONS OF THEIR HAVING BEEN ADOPTED FROM OVERSEAS ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS,
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.