Dogfen lywodraethu THE QUALITY ASSURANCE AGENCY FOR HIGHER EDUCATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAR 2017 as amended on 22 Apr 2021 as amended on 21 Feb 2023 as amended on 15 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF QUALITY AND STANDARDS IN TERTIARY EDUCATION IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE; 2. ENHANCEMENT OF TEACHING AND LEARNING, AND THE IDENTIFICATION AND PROMOTION OF INNOVATION AND GOOD PRACTICE IN TEACHING AND LEARNING; 3. PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND THE PUBLICATION OF REPORTS ON QUALITY AND STANDARDS IN TERTIARY EDUCATION IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE; AND 4. PROVISION OF ADVICE TO GOVERNMENTS, AS REQUESTED, ON ACCESS COURSE RECOGNITION AND IN RELATION TO ALL OR ANY OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.