Dogfen lywodraethu BEATING BOWEL CANCER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8/10/99 & 5/10/2010 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17/7/1997, 11/05/2006 AND 11/02/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS, IN ALL ASPECTS OF COLORECTAL CANCER , INCLUDING BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO ITS CAUSES, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE; TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM COLORECTAL CANCER; AND TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND ACQUAINTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.