THE ENDOWMENT FUND OF THE SCHOOLS OF QUEEN ELIZABETH THE FIRST, BARNET

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Grants for educational purposes are given to individuals and, in the form of Special Purpose Grants, to the two Queen Elizabeth's Schools. Please note that individual beneficiaries of the charity must be students who are about to attend, are attending or have attended the schools of Queen Elizabeth the First, Barnet. They must be under 25.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

10 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Barnet
Llywodraethu
- 11 Mai 1998: Cofrestrwyd
- Q E ENDOWMENT FUND BARNET (Enw gwaith)
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
10 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTYN HENRY STEWART BRADISH | Cadeirydd |
|
||||||||
Giuliano Pietro Eugenio Gregori | Ymddiriedolwr | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Revd Samuel Benjamin Stuart Rossiter-Peters | Ymddiriedolwr | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
ALAN EUGENE SOLOMON | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 November 2011 |
|
|||||||
SUSAN PAMELA CASWELL | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||||
MRS VOULLA DEMETRI | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||||
ERIC HOUSTON | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||||
DAVID JOHN PERKINS | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||||
MRS WENDY PRENTICE | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||||
GILLIAN MYRA WILLIAMS | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £55.92k | £83.33k | £33.86k | £44.13k | £44.14k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £31.60k | £87.15k | £11.59k | £84.93k | £38.58k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 05 Rhagfyr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 05 Rhagfyr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 02 Chwefror 2024 | 2 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 02 Chwefror 2024 | 2 diwrnod yn hwyr | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 01 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 01 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 07 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 07 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 24 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 24 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSION DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 APR 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
APPLICATION OF INCOME OF THE BOYS' ENDOWMENT:- THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY UP TO 80% OF THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE BOY'S ENDOWMENT IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT PROVIDED FROM PUBLIC FUNDS FOR THE QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GRANT MAINTAINED BOYS SCHOOL, BARNET AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS. THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND YOUNG MEN UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-FIVE YEARS WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED THE SAID BOYS SCHOOL AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; (B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ASSIST WITH THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS OR TO TRAVEL TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION; (C) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BENEFICIARIES. APPLICATION OF INCOME OF THE GIRLS' ENDOWMENT:- THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY UP TO 80% OF THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE GIRLS' ENDOWMENT IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE QUEEN ELIZABETH'S COUNTY MAINTAINED SCHOOL FOR GIRLS, BARNET AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS. THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-FIVE YEARS WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED THE GIRLS SCHOOL AND ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; (B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ASSIST WITH THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS OR TO TRAVEL TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION; (D) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BENEFICIARIES. DISCRETIONARY FUND WHERE A BEQUEST OR DONATION IS RECEIVED, AND IT IS NOT DESIGNATED AS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BOYS’ ENDOWMENT OR THE GIRLS’ ENDOWMENT SUCH MONIES SHALL BE CREDITED TO THE DISCRETIONARY FUND. THE NET INCOME AFTER DEFRAYING THE DIRECT COSTS OF THE DISCRETIONARY FUND SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THE MANNER AND FOR THE OBJECTS PRESCRIBED IN CLAUSES 26 TO 31 OF THE SCHEME OF 3 FEBRUARY 1998 SAVE THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE SOLE DISCRETION IN APPLYING THAT INCOME IN WHATEVER PROPORTIONS, IF ANY, THAT THEY SHALL DECIDE TO THE BENEFIT OF THE BOYS OR GIRLS AND SHALL NOT BE BOUND BY THE PERCENTAGES SET OUT IN CLAUSES 27, 28, 30 OR 31 OF THE SCHEME OF 3 FEBRUARY 1998.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
19 Homefield Road
WARE
SG12 7NG
- Ffôn:
- 01920 484382
- E-bost:
- pgyates19@outlook.com
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window