CORAM FAMILY AND CHILDCARE LTD

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Coram Family and Childcare works to make the UK a better place for families by bringing together what we learn from our on the ground parent-led programmes and our to research to advocate for solutions that parents want and need. We focus on childcare and early years to make a difference to families' lives now and in the long term.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £103,101 o 2 gontract(au) llywodraeth
Pobl

9 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 11 Awst 2015: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 327279 DAYCARE TRUST
- 16 Medi 1999: Cofrestrwyd
- FAMILY AND PARENTING INSTITUTE (Enw gwaith)
- FAMILY AND CHILDCARE TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- NATIONAL FAMILY AND PARENTING INSTITUTE (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
9 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL CURRAN | Cadeirydd | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Ade Labinjo | Ymddiriedolwr | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Rance | Ymddiriedolwr | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Liz Roberts | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Harris | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Yolanda William | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Holly Robinson | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Charlotte Faircloth | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Judith Trowell FRCPsych | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 August 2018 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £425.98k | £502.07k | £416.19k | £375.80k | £466.18k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £400.60k | £371.34k | £422.46k | £385.08k | £402.30k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £147.12k | £146.60k | £34.21k | £103.10k | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £107.74k | £7.18k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | N/A | £2.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £492.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | N/A | £136 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | N/A | £7.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £337.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | £34.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | N/A | £7.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 28 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 28 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 30 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 30 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 31 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 31 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 23 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 23 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 08 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 08 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JUL 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND WELFARE OF AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND HARDSHIP OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS, PARENTS AND PERSONS INVOLVED IN ALL FORMS OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS BY:- A) ENCOURAGING AGENCIES INVOLVED IN PROVIDING RELATIONSHIP SUPPORT AND SUPPORT FOR PARENTS AND CHILDREN TO WORK TOGETHER MORE EFFECTIVELY; B) PROMOTING GOOD PARENTING PRACTICE AND SKILLS; C) ASSISTING FAMILIES AND PROSPECTIVE PARENTS IN THE CARE, UPBRINGING AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE; IN THEIR ADULT RELATIONSHIPS; IN DEALING WITH ISSUES RELATING TO THE CREATION AND BREAKDOWN OF FAMILY UNITS; AND IN RELATIONSHIPS WITHIN EXTENDED FAMILIES; 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE AND TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN AND SUPPORT FACILITIES AND SCHEMES FOR THE CARE RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN INCLUDING CHILDREN WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES OR SCHEMES BY VIRTUE OF THEIR OR THEIR CARERS’ YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED. 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARENTING SKILLS AND THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AND EVALUATING THE IMPACT OF SUCH EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 4) TO CONDUCT OR COMMISSION RESEARCH INTO THE DEMOGRAPHIC, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL, HEALTH AND OTHER FACTORS INFLUENCING CONTEMPORARY FAMILY LIFE, THE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PARENTS, PROSPECTIVE PARENTS, PARENTS AND CHILDREN AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC; AND 5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. PROVIDED THAT IN PURSUING THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY REGARD SHALL BE HAD AT ALL TIMES TO THE DIFFERING FAMILY FORUMS, TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES WHICH EXIST IN GREAT BRITAIN AS A MULTI-CULTURAL SOCIETY. THROUGHOUT THESE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ‘CHARITABLE’ MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, THE SYSTEM OF LAW GOVERNING THE CONSTITUTION OF THE CHARITY IS THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Coram Campus
41 Brunswick Square
London
WC1N 1AZ
- Ffôn:
- 020 7239 7535
- E-bost:
- info@familyandchildcaretrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window