Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL FOREST CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/06/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/01/1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2015 as amended on 06 Jun 2018 as amended on 15 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN PARTICULAR IN THE COUNTIES OF LEICESTERSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE AND STAFFORDSHIRE AND TO HOLD AND DEVELOP LAND IN THE OWNERSHIP OR OCCUPATION OF THE COMPANY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE OCCUPATIONS AND IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1955ARCH
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS FOR AREA OF BENEFIT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.