HORSHAM YMCA
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity provides sporting and leisure facilities for young people in Horsham and the surrounding areas, and also a range of other community based activities in Horsham.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 08 September 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gorllewin Sussex
Llywodraethu
- 19 Mehefin 2015: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1079570 YMCA DOWNSLINK GROUP
- 02 Chwefror 1999: Cofrestrwyd
- 19 Mehefin 2015: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 08/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £444.16k | £86.94k | £108.02k | £82.31k | £114.96k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £519.86k | £88.61k | £108.76k | £127.06k | £177.36k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 08 Medi 2014 | 27 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 08 Medi 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2013 | 20 Chwefror 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2013 | 20 Chwefror 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2012 | 05 Mawrth 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2012 | 05 Mawrth 2013 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2011 | 04 Chwefror 2013 | 280 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2011 | 04 Chwefror 2013 | 280 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/06/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM 2) TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES 5) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window