Dogfen lywodraethu AVENUES SOUTH EAST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 OCT 2017 as amended on 13 Aug 2018 as amended on 12 May 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE, AND TO ASSIST IN THE SUPPORT AND PROMOTION OF, THE INTELLECTUAL, EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, SPECIAL NEEDS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, SENSORY IMPAIRMENTS, MENTAL ILLNESS AND MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.