CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The advancement of the Christian Faith by the preaching and proclamation of the Christian Gospel, the teaching of Christian doctrine and principles and the pastoral care of Christian people. The relief of persons who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress. Education on the basis of Christian principles and the promotion of other charitable purposes beneficial to the community.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2010
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Stafford
Llywodraethu
- 30 Hydref 2012: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1135259 KINGDOM ADVANCE NETWORK
- 07 Chwefror 2001: Cofrestrwyd
- 30 Hydref 2012: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- CHRISTIAN INTERNATIONAL FAMILY CHURCH (Enw gwaith)
- WATCHMAN INTERCESSORS NETWORK (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £235.42k | £181.19k | £219.56k | £234.54k | £87.53k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £228.20k | £164.83k | £175.83k | £297.68k | £622.27k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | 23 Hydref 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | 23 Hydref 2011 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2009 | 27 Hydref 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2009 | 27 Hydref 2010 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 18 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 18 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 OCTOBER 2000
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE FOURTH SCHEDULE HERETO AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR ELECTRONICALLY AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLE. 4. THE PROMOTION OF OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN AND AROUND BURTON ON TRENT AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS THE TRUST MAY FROM TIME TO TIME OPERATE .
Maes buddion
BURTON ON TRENT OR SUCH OTHER PLACES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window