Dogfen lywodraethu THE COLDSTREAM GUARDS COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Rhif yr elusen: 1091674
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 9 JUNE 1964, AMENDED SCHEME OF 17 MAY 1991, 28 APRIL 1998, ORDER OF 8 APRIL 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND ESTABLISHED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF THE 9TH JUNE 1964 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITIES AFFECTED BY THE SAID SCHEME.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
ARMED FORCES NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.