Dogfen lywodraethu QUAKER CONCERN FOR THE ABOLITION OF TORTURE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED 13 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 SEP 2008 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, EDUCATE AND RAISE THE AWARENESS OF QUAKERS, MEMBERS OF OTHER CHURCHES, PEOPLE OF OTHER FAITHS, MEMBERS OF THE GOVERNMENT AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC CONCERNING: THE ABSOLUTE NATURE OF THE BAN ON TORTURE UNDER INTERNATIONAL LAW, THE REALITIES OF THE USE OF TORTURE IN THE WORLD TODAY, INCLUDING DAMAGING EFFECTS ON BOTH VICTIMS OF TORTURE AND TORTURERS, AND THE WIDER EFFECTS OF TORTURE ON CIVIC SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.