Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH CHIHUAHUA CLUB RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 2002, AS AMENDED IN SGM DATED 2ND AUGUST 2003. as amended on 13 Jan 2019 as amended on 14 May 2023 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025 as amended on 04 May 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CHIHUAHUA DOGS IN NEED OF CARE, ATTENTION OR REHOMING AS A RESULT OF ILL TREATMENT, NEGLECT OR CHANGED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.