Dogfen lywodraethu OPEN ARMS INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO RELIEVE SUFFERING, DISTRESS AND HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) OF CHILDREN IN AFRICA WHO HAVE BEEN ORPHANED, ABANDONED AND/OR NEGLECTED/ABUSED, AND THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY DISASTERS, POVERTY, CIVIL WAR AND CONFLICT, REGARDLESS OF RELIGION, NATIONALITY, RACE POLITICAL AFFILIATION OR GENDER; 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN AFRICA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; 3. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN AFRICA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH TEACHING, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, CHURCH AND PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.