Dogfen lywodraethu MOOR ALLERTON ELDERLY CARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2008 as amended on 22 Oct 2020 as amended on 16 Nov 2020 as amended on 22 Oct 2020 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 30 Dec 2020 as amended on 24 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The relief of those in need, by reason of age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage in the Moor Allerton, Alwoodley and Shadwell areas of Leeds and throughout the county of West Yorkshire and wider area.
Maes buddion
IN THE MOOR ALLERTON AND SHADWELL AREA OF THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.