RELATE BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Adult Relationship Counselling for couples and individuals, Counselling for Young People (Talktime), Family Counselling, Psychosexual Therapy, Life Skills Training, Education and Workshops.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Bedford
- Canol Swydd Bedford
- Luton
Llywodraethu
- 29 Ionawr 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 207314 R NATIONAL REALISATIONS (2024)
- 25 Mawrth 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 29 Ionawr 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- RELATE BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON (Enw gwaith)
- RELATE BEDFORD (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £330.87k | £324.68k | £304.82k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £304.80k | £301.16k | £297.26k | £194.85k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £144.00k | £41.85k | £81.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 19 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 06 Mawrth 2020 | 35 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 04 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 04 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 29 Ionawr 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 29 Ionawr 2018 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/09/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/07/2014 as amended on 26 Mar 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; (2)TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY;- INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE; AND WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS. (3) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; (4) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (5) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC
Maes buddion
BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window