Dogfen lywodraethu BALLET BLACK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25TH OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7TH JANUARY 2004. AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 04 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 04 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 MAR 2019 as amended on 28 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
BALLET BLACK EXISTS TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF CLASSICAL BALLET BY THE PROMOTION OF A BALLET COMPANY AND BALLET SCHOOL, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ENCOURAGING THOSE FROM THE ETHNIC MINORITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN AND APPRECIATE THE ART OF BALLET.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.