THE WILLIAM AND PATRICIA VENTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
(1) The support & relief of the elderly. (2) To relieve the suffering of animals in need of care & attention.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Anifeiliaid
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 21 Mai 2004: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Hone | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin Timothy Hill | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Saunby | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £95.86k | £73.01k | £93.79k | £88.38k | £84.84k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £190.38k | £148.68k | £78.66k | £22.00k | £113.31k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 02 Rhagfyr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 02 Rhagfyr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 25 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 25 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 20 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 20 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 23 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 23 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 07 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 07 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DEED OF CHARITABLE TRUST DATED 11 FEBRUARY 2004 as amended on 14 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES THAT IS TO SAY:- 3.1 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND ENDOWMENT (IN THE JOINT NAMES OF THE FOUNDERS OR THE SOLE NAME OR EITHER OF THEM) ACQUISITION PROVISION DEVELOPMENT ENLARGEMENT CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT FITTING OUT FURNISHING DECORATION MAINTENANCE REPAIR INSURANCE IMPROVEMENT RECONSTRUCTION AND GENERAL UPKEEP OF DAY CENTRES IN CITIES TOWNS AND VILLAGES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES AND THE PAYMENT OF ALL OUTGOINGS IN CONNECTION WITH AND THE GENERAL EXPENSES OF CARRYING ON AND MANAGING SUCH DAY CENTRES 3.2 THE ASSISTANCE OF THE BENEFICIARIES OR ANY OF THEM BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD AND OTHER FACILITIES AT SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL ENSURE THAT THE COST TO THE BENEFICIARIES OF FOOD AND OTHER FACILITIES PROVIDED BY AND AT SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID IS KEPT AS LOW AS POSSIBLE 3.3 THE ASSISTANCE OF THE BENEFICIARIES OR ANY OF THEM BY THE PROVISION OF MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION TO AND FROM SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID OR THE PAYMENT OF ALL OR ANY PART OF THEIR TRAVELLING EXPENSES TO AND FROM SUCH DAY CENTRES AFORESAID AS SHALL IN EITHER CASE BE APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL ENSURE THAT THE COST TO THE BENEFICIARIES OF SUCH TRANSPORTATION OR TRAVEL IS KEPT AS LOW AS POSSIBLE 3.4 THE RELIEF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RESCUE HOMES OR FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS 3.5 THE MAKING OR PROVISION (IN THE JOINT NAMES OF THE FOUNDERS OR THE SOLE NAME OR EITHER OF THEM) OF DONATIONS GRANTS LOANS OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO: (I) AGE CONCERN OR ANY OTHER ASSOCIATION TRUST ORGANISATION INSTITUTION OR BODY CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED WHICH IS FOR THE TIME BEING A REGISTERED CHARITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE PURPOSES REFERRED TO IN SUB-CLAUSES (1) (2) AND (3) OF THIS CLAUSE 3 (II) THE RSPCA OR ANY OTHER ASSOCIATION TRUST ORGANISATION INSTITUTION OR BODY CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED WHICH IS FOR THE TIME BEING A REGISTERED CHARITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE PURPOSES REFERRED TO IN SUB-CLAUSE (4) OF THIS CLAUSE 3 3.6 THE MAKING (IN THE JOINT NAMES OF THE FOUNDERS OR THE SOLE NAME OF EITHER OF THEM) IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT OF DONATIONS OR GRANTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS ORGANISATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR BODIES CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED HAVING THEIR SOLE OR PRINCIPAL OBJECTS: (I) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO BY REASON OF OLD AGE OR INFIRMITY ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OR SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES; OR (II) THE PROMOTION OF HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS AND THE PREVENTION OR SUPPRESSION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS OR SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Southlands
9 Southlands
Kettering
Northants
NN15 7QG
- Ffôn:
- 01536414102
- E-bost:
- info@venton-trust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window