Dogfen lywodraethu GLOBE COMMUNITY PROJECT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JUNE 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JUL 2015 as amended on 18 Sep 2019 as amended on 12 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GLOBE TOWN, TOWER HAMLETS, AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND SOMETIMES INCLUDING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ENHANCE EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
GLOBE TOWN, TOWER HAMLETS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.