Dogfen lywodraethu OPTUA UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/11/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE, AND TO ASSIST IN THE SUPPORT AND PROMOTION OF, THE INTELLECTUAL, EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, ELDERLY PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, COMPLEX NEEDS, PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, SENSORY IMPAIRMENTS, AUTISM, MENTAL ILLNESS, MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS, LONG TERM ILLNESS AND ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY
Maes buddion
WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING NORTHERN IRELAND.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.