Ethiopian Community in the West Midlands

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Advice and guidance for refugees and asylum seekers in the areas of immigration, welfare benefit, housing, health, etc. Children and youth activities including after school classes, outings, sport and leisure (including physical), football, community events. Our activities cover the whole West Midlands area although we are based in Birmingham city.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Dinas Birmingham
- Dinas Coventry
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Llywodraethu
- 10 Ionawr 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- ECWM (Enw gwaith)
- ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY (Enw gwaith)
- ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY IN THE WEST MIDLANDS (Enw blaenorol)
- THE BLACK LIONS COMMUNITY LINK (Enw blaenorol)
- Yr Awdurdod Ymddygiad Ariannol
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tesfaye Solomon | Cadeirydd | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendewesen Jembere Gelaye | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eyob Balcha Gebremariam | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Aynalem Negash | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 17 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 05 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 06 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 27 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 29 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 14/12/2005 AS AMENDED ON 15/01/2012 as amended on 04 Jan 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1)THE CHARITY’S MAIN OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF THE MIGRANT COMMUNITIES (REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS, OTHER RECENT MIGRANTS) FROM EASTERN AFRICA IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION, WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, REPRESENTATION, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS ASYLUM AND IMMIGRATION, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT. (2)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF NEW COMERS FROM EASTERN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEIR INCLUSION IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY. (3)TO MAINTAIN THE UNITY AND SOCIAL COHESION OF THE MIGRANT COMMUNITY FROM EASTERN AFRICA IN THE WEST MIDLANDS BY ORGANIZING SOCIAL EVENTS AND REFUGEE WEEK AND GET TOGETHER EVENTS TO INTEGRATE THEM IN SOCIETY (4)TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MIGRANTS FROM EASTERN AFRICA IN THE WEST MIDLANDS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (5)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN MIGRANTS FROM EASTERN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN DISPUTES OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICTS WHERE THAT DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE. (6) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE OF MIGRANT ORIGINS FROM EASTERN AFRICA, UP TO THE AGE OF 25, LIVING IN WEST MIDLANDS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: •DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES, •ADVANCING EDUCATION, •RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT AND •PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY
Maes buddion
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
54 Deer Park Way
BIRMINGHAM
B33 8EW
- Ffôn:
- 07411954610
- E-bost:
- ethiocomwm@yahoo.co.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window