THE TWIST PROJECT
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We are a Charity organization in the area of Pinehurst and Penhill. In both area's we hold free open play sessions for 6 -14 year olds. This can include arts arts and crafts, outdoor play and many more.We often bring outside entertainers in which includes our favourite which is circus skills. During the school holidays we often have free trips to various places, e.g Bowood. For information pl
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 November 2010
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Swindon
Llywodraethu
- 03 Ebrill 2012: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1087034 CLIVEY AND TWIST
- 21 Tachwedd 2007: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Ebrill 2012: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/11/2008 | 30/11/2009 | 30/11/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £22.22k | £35.88k | £34.37k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £12.99k | £29.03k | £30.26k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Tachwedd 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Tachwedd 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Tachwedd 2010 | 23 Tachwedd 2011 | 54 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Tachwedd 2010 | 26 Ebrill 2011 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Tachwedd 2009 | 26 Gorffennaf 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Tachwedd 2009 | 12 Awst 2010 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Tachwedd 2008 | 24 Tachwedd 2009 | 55 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Tachwedd 2008 | 19 Mehefin 2009 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 JULY 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. CHARITY OBJECTS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE NORTH SWINDON AREA THROUGH PLAY. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE NORTH SWINDON AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
THE NORTH SWINDON AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window