ARCHDIOCESE OF ORTHODOX PARISHES OF RUSSIAN TRADITION IN WESTERN EUROPE-EXARCHATE OF THE ECUMENICAL PATRIARCHATE-DEANERY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The pastoral care and episcopal oversight of the parishes and communities in Great Britain and Ireland which adhere to the Archdiocese of Orthodox Parishes of Russian Tradition in Western Europe under the Ecumenical Patriarchate.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Ireland
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 25 Medi 2017: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1164976 THE EXARCHATE UK DEANERY
- 29 Mai 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Medi 2017: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- DEANERY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Enw gwaith)
- THE EPISCOPAL VICARIATE OF ORTHODOX PARISHES OF RUSSIAN TRADITION IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £46.93k | £38.34k | £37.24k | £43.05k | £47.55k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £27.69k | £39.48k | £39.00k | £49.59k | £36.78k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | 31 Hydref 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | 31 Hydref 2016 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | 05 Hydref 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | 05 Hydref 2015 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 04 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 04 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MAY 2008, AS AMENDED 18 OCT 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF CHURCH GOVERNMENT ACCEPTED BY THE VICARIATE IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND. THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH SHALL MEAN THE FAITH OF THE ONE HOLY ORTHODOX - CATHOLIC AND APOSTOLIC CHURCH, ROOTED IN THE HOLY TRADITION, AND TAUGHT BY THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, THE SEVEN ECUMENICAL COUNCILS AND THE LOCAL AND PROVINCIAL COUNCILS, AND BY THE HOLY FATHERS, AND AS PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE CHURCHES OF THE FOUR ANCIENT PATRIARCHATES OF CONSTANTINOPLE JERUSALEM ANTIOCH AND ALEXANDRIA AND BY THE CHURCHES NOW IN COMMUNION WITH ANY OR ALL OF THEM.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window