REAL LIFE PARENTING (RLP SERVICES) LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Real Life Parenting works with disabled children and young people running a variety of successful and innovative programs including: - Regular after school, play scheme and creche provision designed around the needs of disabled children - An employment programme for disabled young people
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Newham
Llywodraethu
- 06 Tachwedd 2015: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 275936 KIDS
- 10 Rhagfyr 2007: Cofrestrwyd
- 06 Tachwedd 2015: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/06/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £242.72k | £95.38k | £129.25k | £99.28k | £107.73k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £249.82k | £101.63k | £159.06k | £119.27k | £106.28k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 28 Tachwedd 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 28 Tachwedd 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 03 Medi 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 03 Medi 2013 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 31 Gorffennaf 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 31 Gorffennaf 2012 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/03/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST PARENTS, CARERS, THOSE WITH PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND PROFESSIONALS CONCERNED WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; B TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WHO HAVE A DISABILITY OR IMPAIRMENT, AND THEIR PARENT AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BY I THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVISORY, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICES; II PROMOTING AN INCREASE IN THE RANGE OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AVAILABLE; III THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; C TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT CHILDHOOD DISABILITY AND IMPAIRMENT AND THEIR IMPACT ON THE CHILD, SIBLINGS, PARENTS AND OTHER CARERS.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window