Dogfen lywodraethu AGE CYMRU
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 SEP 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2016 as amended on 26 Sep 2017 as amended on 31 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1. PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE 3.2. ADVANCING EDUCATION 3.3. PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL) 3.4. PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY 3.5. PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS 3.6. ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR DISADVANTAGE 3.7. PROMOTING TRAINING, ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE 3.8. OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT WALES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.