Dogfen lywodraethu LIGHT TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAR 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A. PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE FORMATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ORGANISATIONS COMMITTED TO EDUCATION, COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING, RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP; AND B. PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE FORMATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ORGANISATIONS COMMITTED TO COMMUNITY BENEFIT NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.