Dogfen lywodraethu CHARITY OF ANN HOLT
Rhif yr elusen: 502391

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
HIGH COURT SCHEME OF THE 8 DECEMBER 1921 AND VARYING SCHEME OF THE 16 AUGUST 1932 AND SCHEME OF 15 MAY 1974. AS AMENDED ON 04 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 SEP 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE PENSIONS FOR WOMEN OVER 50 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF CALDERDALE FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
HE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF CALDERDALE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.