THE DOUGLAS HAIG FELLOWSHIP
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Douglas Haig Fellowship encourages academic study of Field Marshal Earl Haig of Bemersyde and the armies he commanded in the Great War 1914-18. Each year it publishes a scholarly publication, makes an award to a post graduate student, appoints a Haig Fellow and holds two luncheon meetings. The Fellowship also fulfils a Commemorative Object, keeping a watching brief on statues & memorials.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 03 Rhagfyr 2018: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 219279 THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION
- 15 Chwefror 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Rhagfyr 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £8.41k | £5.54k | £5.22k | £5.78k | £4.77k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £7.59k | £4.19k | £4.39k | £5.24k | £4.84k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 20 Tachwedd 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 29 Mawrth 2018 | 57 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 11 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 10 Mawrth 2016 | 39 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JAN 1995 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AMONGST THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING PUBLIC MEMORIALS TO COMMEMORATE AND REMEMBER THE LIFE OF DOUGLAS HAIG (1861 - 1928), FIELD MARSHAL EARL HAIG OF BEMERSYDE ('THE FIELD MARSHAL), THE FORCES HE COMMANDED AND THOSE WHO LOST THEIR LIVES OR SUFFERED INJURY, OR PUT THEMSELVES AT RISK OF LOSS OF LIFE OR INJURY, IN SERVICE OF THE PUBLIC. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE OF THE FIELD MARSHAL, HIS ACHIEVEMENTS, THOSE OF THE FORCES HE COMMANDED AND THE CONTINUING MILITARY LESSONS OF THEIR LEGACY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PURSUIT OF OBJECTIVE STUDY IN THE FOLLOWING AREAS: THE CONTRIBUTION OF THE FIELD-MARSHAL TO MILITARY REFORM; HIS GENERALSHIP AND THAT OF HIS SUBORDINATE COMMANDERS; THE COMMAND AND CONTROL OF THE BRITISH ARMY DURING THE FIRST WORLD WAR; THE FORM AND WORKING OF THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN THE POLITICAL SUPREME COMMAND AND MILITARY COMMANDERS; THE CONDUCT OF COALITION OPERATIONS; THE PRINCIPLES AND APPLICATION OF MILITARY DOCTRINE GENERALLY; THE EFFICIENCY OF MILITARY MEDICINE AND MEDICAL SERVICES; AND THE PUBLIC DUTY OF CARE FOR VETERANS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window