Dogfen lywodraethu Fairfield Independent Hospital
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 OCTOBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JULY 1977, 2 APRIL 1980, 14 FEBRUARY 1986, 28 FEBRUARY 2001, 2 DECEMBER 2004 AND 8 DECEMBER 2005 as amended on 14 Aug 2019 as amended on 04 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE MANAGE AND MAINTAIN A NURSING HOME OR NURSING HOMES FOR THE RELIEF OF 1) PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR INCAPACITY (WHETHER TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT) OR WHO ARE CONVALESCING THEREFROM; 2) THE AGED; AND 3) PREGNANT WOMEN BUT NOT FOR THE PURPOSE OF PERFORMING ABORTION. (AA) TO PROMOTE MANAGE AND MAINTAIN A RESIDENTIAL HOME, OR RESIDENTIAL HOMES, FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.