MEANWHILE FOUNDATION

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Meanwhile Foundation exists to turn empty property costs into social value. Working with partner organisations, it supports Meanwhile Use by taking the risk on empty property in which projects delivered can support the company objectives. Activities include business support, space for community projects, training and skills development.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

7 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 03 Mai 2013: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
7 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Andrew White | Cadeirydd | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Baldwin | Ymddiriedolwr | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela Spangenthal | Ymddiriedolwr | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Berwyn | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Tsang | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Hearn | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SCOTT ALCOCK | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 March 2013 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £325.09k | £36.08k | £12.09k | £45.14k | £9.95k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £224.47k | £131.92k | £12.23k | £34.98k | £7.93k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £324.90k | £35.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 31 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 31 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 31 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 18 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 06 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 06 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 21 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 21 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE PARTNERSHIP AREAS) BY ALL OF OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RETRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE AND SUPPORT WHERE PRACTICAL AND NECESSARY; 3.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: 3.1.4.1 IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR 3.1.4.2 TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.1.6 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.1.7 THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.1.8 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 3.1.9 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; 3.1.10 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION; AND 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND 3.3 THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
71-75 Albion Street
London
SE16 7JA
- Ffôn:
- 02077374135
- E-bost:
- info@meanwhile.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window