CHESTER VOLUNTARY ACTION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Chester Voluntary Action is a local support and development organisation which promotes and supports voluntary action in the local authority area of Cheshire West and Chester through the provision of our core services and those of our Volunteer Centre to local third sector organisations and to individual members of the public interested in volunteering.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2010
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Gorllewin Swydd Gaerlleon A Chaer
Llywodraethu
- 24 Tachwedd 2011: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1136465 Cheshire West Voluntary Action
- 25 Tachwedd 1974: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Tachwedd 2011: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £310.94k | £205.04k | £159.56k | £265.86k | £301.21k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £279.24k | £249.40k | £177.00k | £222.36k | £268.47k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2010 | 14 Rhagfyr 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2010 | 14 Rhagfyr 2010 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 15 Rhagfyr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 15 Rhagfyr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 13 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 13 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 1973 AMENDED 4 JULY 1983 AS AMENDED 4TH NOVEMBER 2003 AND 19 NOVEMBER 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: A)TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF CHESHIRE WEST AND CHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS [HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS B)TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AOB; PROVIDED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THESE CHARITABLE PURPOSES, THE CHARITY WILL SEEK TO CHALLENGE ALL FORMS OF OPPRESSION AND INEQUALITY AND TO GIVE PRIORITY TO WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHOSE FULL PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY IS LIMITED BY ECONOMIC, POLITICAL AND SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE.
Maes buddion
LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF CHESHIRE WEST AND CHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window