WORCESTER NEWS AND EQUIPMENT SERVICE FOR THE BLIND
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity provides a weekly 90 minute tape cassette of local news to blind and partially sighted people in and around Worcester, all completely free of cost. We also provide a talking book literary service all free. Tape players are provided free on request.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Anabledd
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Gaerwrangon
Llywodraethu
- 24 Medi 2020: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1180242 WORCESTER NEWS AND EQUIPMENT SERVICES FOR THE BLIN...
- 06 Hydref 1977: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Medi 2020: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- TALKING NEWSPAPER (Enw gwaith)
- WORCESTER TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Enw gwaith)
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £8.12k | £792 | £1.98k | £3.23k | £3.67k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £5.55k | £9.46k | £7.18k | £15.09k | £5.17k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 31 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 13 Mawrth 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | 30 Mehefin 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 20 SEPTEMBER 1977
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING AND WRITING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF: (A) RECORDED TAPES; (B) CASSETTE TAPE-RECORDERS, BRAILLE WRITERS, TYPEWRITERS AND SUCH OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION ON LOAN OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE COMMITTEE AND (C) ASSISTANCE WITH TELEPHONE INSTALLATION CHARGES AND RENTALS IF SUFFICIENT FUNDS ARE AVAILABLE AFTER THE NEEDS OF (A) AND (B) ABOVE HAVE BEEN MET.
Maes buddion
CITY OF WORCESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window