Dogfen lywodraethu THE W P H CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 FEBRUARY 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JULY 1993, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 9 JUNE 1995 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 JUNE 1996. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PREVENT, RELIEVE AND CURE SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH OF EVERY KIND ( INCLUDING PHYSICAL INJURES) AND TO PROMOTE HEALTH IN ANY WAY WHICH SHALL BE FOR THE TIME BEING CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN PARTICULAR(BUT WITHOUT EITHER DEROGATING FROM THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING OR EXTENDING THE SCOPE THEREOF TO OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT IN LAW CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE FOR PATIENTS RESIDENT(AND IF THOUGHT FIT NON-RESIDENT) IN NURSING HOMES, HOSPITAL PAY BEDS AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.