TERRE DES HOMMES UK
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Tdh UK is a member of the global Tdh family, with particularly strong institutional links to Tdh Lausanne, Switzerland, with which it shares the same values and working principles. It funds the humanitarian and development work of the Tdh family worldwide.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 June 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- Brasil
- Burkina Faso
- Byrma
- Cenia
- Colombia
- Ecwador
- Gweriniaeth De Swdan
- Haiti
- Hondwras
- Hwngari
- India
- Iorddonen
- Libanus
- Mali
- Moldofa
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Periw
- Rwmania
- Syria
- Tiriogaethau Palesteina
- Togo
- Ukrain
Llywodraethu
- TDH UK (Enw gwaith)
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £17.41k | £60.45k | £75.78k | £463.77k | £383.21k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £11.37k | £43.33k | £88.90k | £354.35k | £508.30k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2021 | 09 Medi 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2021 | 09 Medi 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 15 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 15 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 28 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 28 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 23 Ionawr 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 23 Ionawr 2019 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Sep 2016 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 2. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND WITH A FOCUS ON THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window