Dogfen lywodraethu LINCOLN MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL
Rhif yr elusen: 509415

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1939 AMENDED 11 JUNE 1979 AND 27 JUNE 1984 AND 14 JUNE 2000 AND 17TH NOVEMBER 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE GENERALLY, AND BY MEANS OF AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL IN PARTICULAR, THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE OF MUSIC, DANCING, ELOCUTION, LITERATURE AND ACTING IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.