Dogfen lywodraethu COMPTON CARE GROUP LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 MARCH 2001 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 APR 2018 as amended on 30 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 To assist in the provision of care for people with advancing and progressive long-term health conditions and terminal illness who are principally resident in Wolverhampton, Dudley, Walsall, Sandwell and the counties of Shropshire and South and East Staffordshire and any additional locations as agreed by the Directors, primarily but not exclusively through: 3.1.1 undertaking appropriate ancillary activities and services including the provision of residential care and care co-ordination of palliative and social care services; 3.1.2 conducting or promoting research into the care and treatment of people with progressive long-term conditions; and 3.1.3 the advancement of education in the provision of palliative care and related disciplines.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.