Dogfen lywodraethu SEVERN HOSPICE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/01/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, THE WELL-BEING OF PATIENTS AND ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE COUNTIES OF SHROPSHIRE AND THE FORMER MONTGOMERYSHIRE AREA OF POWYS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE AND MID WALES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.