GOD IS GIVING
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
God Is Giving brings financial inclusion to financially and socially disadvantaged people, regardless of their religious beliefs. Our free services include money workshops, access to banking, budget building and morally responsible Christian lending via an interest free grant scheme. Working closely with churches, food banks & community front line professionals operating through home visits.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- GIG (Enw gwaith)
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £695 | £1.11k | £1.61k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £672 | £465 | £842 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 25 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 25 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 04 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 04 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 05 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 05 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2019 as amended on 16 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE AND EDUCATION IN RELATION TO, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, MONEY MANAGEMENT AND BUDGETING ADVICE; AND B) PROVIDING GRANTS, INTEREST FREE LENDING, ITEMS, SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IF AND IN SO FAR AS SUCH PURPOSE SHALL BE CHARITABLE. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND DOCTRINE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window