Dogfen lywodraethu THE FIVE TOWNS PLUS HOSPICE FUND LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/12/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH; AND 2. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH AND/OR AGE THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A CARE HOME WITH NURSING.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.