Dogfen lywodraethu ROBERT OWEN COMMUNITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JULY 1986 AND AMENDED 19 APRIL 2004 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED, PARTICULARLY THOSE THAT ARE VULNERABLE DUE TO LEARNING DISABILITIES OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH NEEDS OR THOSE IN POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO MEET THEIR NEEDS, II) TO ADVANCE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH NEEDS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.