Dogfen lywodraethu BRECKNOCK SOCIETY AND MUSEUM FRIENDS CYMDEITHAS BRYCHEINIOG A CHYFEILLION YR AMGUEDDFA
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/04/1986 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 11/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2014 as amended on 09 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE AMONGST THE PEOPLE OF THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF BRECKNOCKSHIRE AN INTEREST IN THE ARCHEOLOGY, HISTORY, GEOLOGY, NATURAL HISTORY, ART, LITERATURE OF WALES AND THE MARCHES AND ESPECIALLY BRECKNOCKSHIRE, AND FOR THAT PURPOSE: (A) TO ASSIST IN ANY WAY IT CAN THE FURTHER DEVELOPMENT OF BRECKNOCK MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY; (B) TO ACQUIRE EXHIBITS OF HISTORICAL OR ANY SPECIAL INTEREST AND OFFER SUCH MATERIAL TO THE MUSEUM ON AGREED TERMS; (C) TO PUBLISH MATERIAL REALTING TO THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY; (D) TO ARRANGE LECTURES, MEETINGS AND EXHIBITIONS AND {E) TO ASSIST FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE IN THE PRESERVATION OF SITES OF HISTORIC IMPORTANCE TO THE AREA OF BRECKNOCK.
Maes buddion
BRECKNOCKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.