CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Religious Activities
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Caint
Llywodraethu
- 06 Chwefror 2024: Cofrestrwyd
- THE CATHEDRAL AND METROPOLITICAL CHURCH OF CHRIST, CANTERBURY (Enw gwaith)
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
9 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Monteith Very Rev | Cadeirydd | 17 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Catherine Jane Ibbotson | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Paul John Sylva FCG FCA | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
PERRICONE GUY | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
PAMELA JANE BAXTER | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
The Venerable William Jonathan Adam | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Reverend Canon Emma Pennington | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Reverend Canon Andrew Dodd | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Reverend Canon Timothy Naish | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 2023 IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CATHEDRALS MEASURE 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
OBJECTS 3. (1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHAPTER ARE (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BY FURTHERING THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION; (B) TO CARE FOR AND CONSERVE THE FABRIC AND STRUCTURE OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH BUILDING; AND (C) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE ANCILLARY TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE REFERRED TO IN SUB-PARAGRAPH (A) OR (B). (2) IN PARAGRAPH (1)? ?THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND? (OR ANGLICAN COMMUNION) MEANS THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND MUTATIS MUTANDIS, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL; ?CATHEDRAL CHURCH BUILDING? MEANS THE BUILDINGS WITHIN THE ECCLESIASTICAL EXEMPTION FOR THE CATHEDRAL; ?CHARITABLE PURPOSES? MEANS PURPOSES WITHIN SECTION 2(1) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011. (3) IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN PARAGRAPH (1), THE CHAPTER MUST ACT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 4(3) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL
CATHEDRAL HOUSE
THE PRECINCTS
CANTERBURY
KENT
CT1 2EH
- Ffôn:
- 01227762862
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.