CROSSLEY AND PORTER ORPHAN HOME AND SCHOOL

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Provision of special benefits for the school conducted at the Charity's property; promotion of education of persons under 25 residing within the Borough of Calderdale or who have attended any school or former school of the Charity; relief of hardship or promotion of education of persons who have lost one or both parents (with preference to persons residing within the former County of York
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2024
Pobl

10 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Calderdale
Llywodraethu
- 27 Mehefin 1961: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
10 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES MARTIN BENEDICT CROSSLEY | Cadeirydd |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN EGGLETON | Ymddiriedolwr | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Baines MBE | Ymddiriedolwr | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS BREARLEY FORD | Ymddiriedolwr | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne CROSSLEY | Ymddiriedolwr | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEVEN CLAPCOTE | Ymddiriedolwr | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOCTOR STEPHEN THORNBER | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDRA JULIA CROSSLEY | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES CHRISTOPHER HODGSON | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||
PETER MORTIMER CROSSLEY | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £44.33k | £38.98k | £38.25k | £43.29k | £47.93k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £43.43k | £49.66k | £57.92k | £44.72k | £43.03k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2024 | 03 Chwefror 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2024 | 03 Chwefror 2025 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2023 | 01 Chwefror 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2023 | 01 Chwefror 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2022 | 03 Chwefror 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2022 | 03 Chwefror 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2021 | 04 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2021 | 04 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2020 | 30 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2020 | 30 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JANUARY 1968, ROYAL CHARTERS DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 1868 AND 30 JANUARY 1887 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 20 DECEMBER 1918, 29 DECEMBER 1960 AND 20 JUNE 1988 AND BY A LETTER OF THE COMMISSION DATED 30 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED BY TRUST MODIFICATION ORDER 19/12/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR SUCH PERIOD AS THE PROPERTY BELONGING TO THE CHARITY FORMERLY USED AS A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL WITHIN THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944-1986 (“THE PROPERTY”) SHALL BE USED AND OCCUPIED AS AN ACADEMY PURSUANT TO THE ACADEMIES ACT 2010 THE PROPERTY SHALL BE APPROPRIATED AND USED AS SUCH AN ACADEMY TO BE KNOWN AS THE CROSSLEY HEATH ACADEMY (OR BY SUCH OTHER NAME AS THE GOVERNING BODY OF SUCH ACADEMY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE) 5 (1) (A) AS TO SUCH SUM AS THE TRUSTEE MAY DETERMINE NOT EXCEEDING •24,000 OR ONE FIFTH OF SUCH INCOME (WHICHEVER IS THE GREATER), OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE CHARITY COMMISSION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE, IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE CROSSLEY HEATH ACADEMY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEE AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL; (1) (B) AS TO SUCH SUM AS THE TRUSTEE MAY DETERMINE NOT EXCEEDING •16,000 OR THREE TENTHS OF SUCH INCOME (WHICHEVER IS THE GREATER), OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE CHARITY COMMISSION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE, IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH COUNCIL OF CALDERDALE OR WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED AS A PUPIL AT ANY SCHOOL OR FORMER SCHOOL OF THE CHARITY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING - (I) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEE; (II) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (1) (C) AS TO THE RESIDUE OF SUCH INCOME, FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE LOST EITHER BOTH PARENTS OR ONE PARENT, OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE LIVING TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY APART, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER COUNTY OF YORK, IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (I) IN RELIEVING SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; (II) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF CALDERDALE
Elusennau cysylltiedig
- 27 Mehefin 1961 : Cofrestrwyd
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Hodgson Hey Ltd
South Lane
ELLAND
West Yorkshire
HX5 0HG
- Ffôn:
- 07841377410
- E-bost:
- will@hodgsonhey.co.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window