Dogfen lywodraethu SHEFFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 29 JUNE 1888 ALTERED BY SCHEMES DATED 14 MARCH 1890, 26 NOVEMBER 1897, 13 MARCH 1905, 26 JULY 1912, 9 JANUARY 1925, 24 JANUARY 1957 AND 17 JANUARY 1979.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL SHEFFIELD. (B) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS OR FINANCIAL HELP TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ENTER A TRADE, PROFESSION OR CALLING FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR ARE ATTENDING, OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL, SHEFFIELD.
Maes buddion
CITY AND COUNTY OF SHEFFIELD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.