Dogfen lywodraethu LEICESTER ARTS CENTRE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/08/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION GENERALLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND OTHER EXAMPLES OF THE PERFORMING ARTS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, FILM, SINGING, MUSIC, POETRY AND THE PRODUCTION AND PRESENTATION OF ETHNIC EVENTS AND EVENTS WITHIN ANY COMMUNITY ARTS PROGRAMME AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.