CARE IN EAST GRINSTEAD AND LINGFIELD

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Care is a charitable organisation set up in 1988 by a group of local churches to help people in East Grinstead and Lingfield as a 'good neighbour'. Care assists in a variety of ways, with shopping or collecting prescriptions or something a bit heavier, such as moving a piece of furniture. Most requests are for transport, for those who are unable to get help in other ways.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

14 Ymddiriedolwyr
59 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gorllewin Sussex
- Surrey
Llywodraethu
- 21 Tachwedd 1988: Cofrestrwyd
- CARE IN EAST GRINSTEAD (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
14 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Breen | Cadeirydd | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Shepherd | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jones | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant Pyner | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Bland | Ymddiriedolwr | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH WOOLLEY | Ymddiriedolwr | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN COLLINGE | Ymddiriedolwr | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MUNRO | Ymddiriedolwr | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valeria Martinelli | Ymddiriedolwr | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Myra Keats | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Deacon | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY DEACON | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Zerelda Lilias Micallef | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM GODFREY BRADBURY | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £11.41k | £4.89k | £13.08k | £16.16k | £15.79k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £15.04k | £4.63k | £11.32k | £12.92k | £16.41k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 20 Medi 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 03 Tachwedd 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 03 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 11 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 21 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 SEP 1988 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 1993 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED ON 21 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2021 as amended on 04 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2. Objects 2.1. The objects for which CARE is established are to relieve in cases of need, hardship or distress, eligible persons (subject to the conditions in Paragraph 2.2) who are resident in the area of or adjacent to the district of East Grinstead in the County of Sussex and Lingfield in the County of Surrey or such enlarged area as the Annual General Meeting may determine, by the provision of such voluntary care and work as may be charitable and in furtherance of these objects but not otherwise, the organisation shall have the following powers:- (a) to provide help in the home to those who through age or infirmity are unable fully to support themselves. Such help may include companionship, gardening and similar practical activities; (b) to provide transport so that eligible people who otherwise would be unable to get out to do their own shopping, collect prescriptions, visit hospitals, clinics, surgeries, visit a friend or relative in a hospital or care/nursing home, or who have other basic needs may do so without feeling a burden on their immediate neighbours; (c) to undertake visiting/befriending in the clients home; (d) to assist and complement other voluntary charitable and state organisations when requested and to give assistance without hindering such organisations or taking away the primary objective for which they have been established; (e) to raise funds and to invite and receive contributions from any person or persons whatsoever by way of subscriptions and otherwise provided that the organisation shall not undertake permanent trading activities in raising funds for its objectives; (f) subject to such consents as may be required by law to sell, let or mortgage, dispose of or turn to account all or any of the property or assets of the organisation and to invest such property, money, assets, securities, shares or other investments as the Committee from time to time shall in their absolute discretion determine; (g) to do all such other things as shall further the charitable objects of the organisation and as may be lawful. 2.2. Regrettably, for legal and/or health & safety reasons, the following persons will not be eligible for transport provision by CARE:- (a) unaccompanied persons under the age of 18; Adopted 7th September 1988 as Amended 29 th September 2021 Page 2 of 5 As agreed at CARE Annual General Meeting 29 th September 2021 (b) children excluded by law from travelling in a private car without a correctly fitted child or booster seat; (c) persons whose disabilities prevent them from correctly wearing a seat belt; (d) persons whose disabilities prevent them from getting into, or out of, a private car without undue physical assistance, unless accompanied at all times by a qualified nurse or care worker; (e) persons who require physical assistance to reach a car from their residence or who are unable to get into, or out of a wheelchair without undue physical assistance, unless accompanied at all times by a qualified nurse or care worker; (f) persons with degenerative illnesses whose actions may be a danger to themselves, their driver or other road users while travelling in a private car, unless accompanied and supervised at all times by a qualified nurse or care worker; (g) persons with a history of abuse (physical or verbal); (h) persons who are involved in claims against CARE or any of its members for as long as the situation remains outstanding.
Maes buddion
IN OR ADJACENT TO EAST GRINSTEAD
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
2nd Floor
Crown House
37 High Street
EAST GRINSTEAD
West Sussex
- Ffôn:
- 01342410086
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window